Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on TRANS. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2020 | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |