Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1284.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|