Senate | 06/18/2020 | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2020 | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2020 | Set for hearing June 1. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3540.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Set for hearing May 14 in INS. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2020 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |