Senate | 05/14/2020 | May 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2020 | Set for hearing May 22. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |