Senate | 06/18/2020 | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3550.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on EQ. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2020 | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |