|
09/30/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 340, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 5173.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 3677.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
June 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3569.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2020
|
March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2020
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|