|
09/18/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
July 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3685.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|