Senate | 06/18/2020 | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3613.) (May 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |