Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on E., U. & C. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2020 | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |