California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019