Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1209.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 550.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|