Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 655.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |