Assembly | 06/29/2020 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2020 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2020 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 3798.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3772.) (June 18). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | Set for hearing June 18. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2020 | Set for hearing June 9. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2020 | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2020 | Set for hearing June 1. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2020 | Set for hearing May 14. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |