|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2019
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 958.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 623.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|