Assembly | 07/27/2020 | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2019 | July 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2019 | June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1365.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |