|
09/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5292.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3676.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2020
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|