Senate | 05/12/2020 | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2020 | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2020 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2020 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2020 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |