|
09/11/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4420.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5220.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/28/2020
|
July 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3683.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3623.) (May 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2020
|
Set for hearing May 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2020
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|