Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 562.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |