|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
July 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2020
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3795.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2020
|
Set for hearing June 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2020
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2020
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|