|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3173.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1090.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 385.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|