|
10/07/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 532, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3330.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1196.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1091.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 848.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|