Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
June 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1001.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|