Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 622.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|