Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1209.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|