|
09/25/2020
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5298.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Rodriguez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Gallagher.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1091.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 652.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|