|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 842, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3038.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 744.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|