|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 300, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Grove.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5296.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2020
|
August 18 set for second hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1263.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 904.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|