Assembly | 09/09/2019 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 918.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 525.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |