|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 205, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2178.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 997.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|