Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2020 | January 15 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2020 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2020 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |