|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 919.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2019
|
March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|