Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 902.) (May 1). | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 890.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Set for hearing May 1 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |