Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 925.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2019 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |