Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1198.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1094.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 437.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|