|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1259.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|