Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 437.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |