California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2019

Amended

Bill June 19, 2019
Bill June 10, 2019