Assembly | 06/11/2019 | June 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 746.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 440.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |