|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2950.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
April 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 440.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|