Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2020
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 384.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|