|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 762, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2438.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 11. Page 2908.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 846.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|