|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2889.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 3435.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1184.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1095.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 547.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|