Assembly | 07/03/2019 | July 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2019 | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2019 | Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1007.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |