Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1007.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 385.) (March 20). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Set for hearing March 20. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |