|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2622.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2621.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
(Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2620.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Art. IV. Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1095.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 622.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
March 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|