|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 591, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2834.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 3195.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
June 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1096.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 798.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 526.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|