Senate | 02/03/2020 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and EQ. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |