California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill May 21, 2019
Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 24, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019