Assembly | 08/30/2019 | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2019 | July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1267.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |